Global Patent Index - EP 0962692 A3

EP 0962692 A3 2001-05-02 - Luminaire comprising a view protective element against insects

Title (en)

Luminaire comprising a view protective element against insects

Title (de)

Leuchte mit Sichtschutz gegen Insekten

Title (fr)

Luminaire avec un élément de protection contre les insectes

Publication

EP 0962692 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110617 A

Priority

DE 19825062 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962692A2] The light has one or more lamps (7) and an at least partly transparent first screen (1) via which light passes downwards in the operating position. A second transparent screen (15) is mounted in the light path between the first screen and the lamp or lamps at a distance from the first screen. The second screen essentially consists of a clear foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 3/02; F21V 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21V 1/14 (2006.01); F21V 3/00 (2015.01); F21V 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 1/14 (2013.01); F21V 3/00 (2013.01); F21V 11/14 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962692 A2 19991208; EP 0962692 A3 20010502; EP 0962692 B1 20070801; AT 368826 T 20070815; DE 19825062 A1 19991216; DE 59914429 D1 20070913

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, 83301 TRAUNREUT, DE

- Document: DE 59914429

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914429

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914429

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59914429

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080506

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070801

2008-02-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914429 P 20070913

2007-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

2007-08-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 13/02 20060101AFI20061214BHEP

2007-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 3/00 20060101ALI20061214BHEP

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI