Global patent index - EP 0962736 A3

EP 0962736 A3 2000-08-16 - Corrugated fin for evaporator with improved condensate removal

Title (en)

Corrugated fin for evaporator with improved condensate removal

Title (de)

Gewellte Rippe für Verdampfer mit verbesserter Kondensatabführung

Title (fr)

Ailette ondulée pour évaporateur avec amélioration du drainage des condensats

Publication

EP 0962736 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201397 A

Priority

US 8854498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962736A2] An improved corrugated heat conduction fin (20) for an evaporator (10) includes an integral feature for reducing the critical width of condensed water films retained in the internal channels formed between diverging pairs of fin walls (22). Aligned pairs of notches (26) are cut through the diverging fin walls (22), localized within the channels and between adjacent pairs of louver banks (24). What would otherwise be a long, continuos water film (F) formed in the fin channel is thereby broken up into a series of discontinuous individual films (F1, F2 and F3), each located over a respective louver bank (24). The individual, shorter films drain more efficiently through the louver banks (24), thereby growing to a significantly smaller critical width within the channels and blocking less air flow over and through the fin walls (22). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/12; F28D 1/03; F28F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F28D 1/03 (2006.01); F28F 1/12 (2006.01); F28F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 17/005 (2013.01); F28D 1/0341 (2013.01); F28F 1/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 2018922 A 19351029 - PALMER OSCAR C
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 153 (M - 149) 13 August 1982 (1982-08-13)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 126 (M - 477) 10 May 1986 (1986-05-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 271 (M - 260) 3 December 1983 (1983-12-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 069 (M - 286) 31 March 1984 (1984-03-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962736 A2 19991208; EP 0962736 A3 20000816; JP 2000028228 A 20000128

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI