Global patent index - EP 0962737 A3

EP 0962737 A3 2000-11-15 - Heat exchanger with inner fin

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with inner fin

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher mit innerer Rippe

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur avec ailette interne

Publication

EP 0962737 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109352 A

Priority

IT VI980109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962737A2] A wall for exchanging heat between a relatively warm fluid, which flows through a tubular passage (3) delimited within a heat-conducting wall (4), and a relatively cold fluid, which externally surrounds and encircles the exchange wall (4), characterized in that the exchange wall (4) is internally provided with a plurality of fins which protrude radially inside the tubular passage and delimit, between them, a plurality of slots (5) for the flow of a fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/20 (2006.01); F28F 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/40 (2013.01); F24H 1/206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962737 A2 19991208; EP 0962737 A3 20001115; IT VI980109 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050105

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040624

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20010425;LT PAYMENT 20010425;LV PAYMENT 20010425;RO PAYMENT 20010425;SI PAYMENT 20010425

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI