Global Patent Index - EP 0962741 B1

EP 0962741 B1 2002-12-04 - Device for provisionally connecting and pyrotechnically separating two non-metallic units

Title (en)

Device for provisionally connecting and pyrotechnically separating two non-metallic units

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur provisorischen Verbindung und zum pyrotechnischen Abtrennen von zwei nichtmetallischen Einheiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de liaison provisoire et de séparation pyrotechinique de deux emsembles non metalliques

Publication

EP 0962741 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401320 A

Priority

FR 9806897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962741A1] The joint comprises two nonmetallic assemblies (10,12) which are provisionally stuck together and separated at the required time by expansion of a pyrotechnic tube (24) fitted between them. The two assemblies are joined together by a connecting piece (22) stuck to two adjacent and parallel components (16,18) so that it covers their separating line (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 15/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/19 (2006.01); F42B 15/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/19 (2013.01); F42B 15/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962741 A1 19991208; EP 0962741 B1 20021204; DE 69904260 D1 20030116; DE 69904260 T2 20030821; ES 2188108 T3 20030616; FR 2779222 A1 19991203; FR 2779222 B1 20000811; US 6250227 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120602

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69904260

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110719

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110713

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050601

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-06-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188108 T3

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904260 20030116

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

2000-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AEROSPATIALE MATRA

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI