Global Patent Index - EP 0962849 A3

EP 0962849 A3 2001-04-25 - Anti-reverse device for the lever in a remote control apparatus

Title (en)

Anti-reverse device for the lever in a remote control apparatus

Title (de)

Rücklaufsperre für den Hebel einer Fernsteuereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif anti-retour pour le levier d'un appareil de commande à distance

Publication

EP 0962849 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200545 A

Priority

IT MI981254 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962849A2] An anti-reverse device for the lever in a remote control apparatus, which is placed in a box (11a, 11b), by means of a trailing cable (14), which can be connected to an outer structure of a driving machine, wherein the box has a first opening (12) for the passage of an operating lever (13) for a single cable core (14) movable within a holding reaction, connected to the box, the lever (13) can oscillate around a pivot (16) between a central position and two positions placed on opposite sides to the central position, and locking means of the lever position (13), which can be easily unlocked, are provided on the outer structure of said box wherein said locking means comprises an external knob (21), to which an elastically flexible ball is joined (28, 29), said ball is snap inserted into cavities (31-33) obtained on the box (11a, 11b), and a shaped plate (35, 36, 37, 38), placed at the end of a rotation shaft (23) of the knob (21), selectively interactive with a pin (34) projecting from the lever (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 5/00; G05G 5/02; G05G 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/00 (2006.01); G05G 5/02 (2006.01); G05G 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 5/08 (2013.01); G05G 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962849 A2 19991208; EP 0962849 A3 20010425; IT MI981254 A1 19991206

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011026

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05G 5/00 A, 7G 05G 5/02 B, 7G 05G 5/08 B

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI