Global Patent Index - EP 0962882 A3

EP 0962882 A3 2000-11-02 - Colour coding method for storing and retrieving objects

Title (en)

Colour coding method for storing and retrieving objects

Title (de)

Farbcodierungsverfahren zum Speichern und Auffinden von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Procédé de codage par couleur pour stocker et retrouver des objets

Publication

EP 0962882 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304167 A

Priority

GB 9812111 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962882A2] A method of colour coding items within a range of items such as a range of elastomeric O-rings, in which each item therein is uniquely identified, the method including the steps of compiling a look-up table divided into a plurality of individual colours, each colour representing a particular group of items in the range, and sub-dividing each colour group by numbers each of which are represented by discrete areas of the colour used in the group, and subsequently marking individual items with the type of colour and number of discrete coloured areas to thereby uniquely identify each such item with reference to the look-up table in accordance with the characteristics of each item. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 19/06; F16J 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/06009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962882 A2 19991208; EP 0962882 A3 20001102; GB 2338035 A 19991208; GB 2338035 B 20020403; GB 9812111 D0 19980805

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20061010

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010329

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06K 19/06 A, 7F 16J 15/00 B

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI