Global Patent Index - EP 0962951 A3

EP 0962951 A3 2000-09-13 - Thermal switch, in particular adjustable temperature controller

Title (en)

Thermal switch, in particular adjustable temperature controller

Title (de)

Temperaturschalter, insbesondere einstellbarer Temperaturregler

Title (fr)

Interrupteur thermique, en particulier régulateur de température réglable

Publication

EP 0962951 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110331 A

Priority

DE 19824871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962951A2] The temp. switch has an expansion element (5) that acts upon a switching spring (21) of a snap switch (21) via a force conversion arrangement and an overload protection arrangement for the switch spring with at least one buffer (41) that works in conjunction with the force conversion arrangement (30) and that is deformable above a threshold force associated with the actuation force of the switch during at the switching point. The force conversion arrangement and buffer form a single unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/22 (2006.01); H01H 36/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/38 (2006.01); H01H 37/40 (2006.01); H01H 3/32 (2006.01); H01H 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/38 (2013.01); H01H 3/32 (2013.01); H01H 13/20 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962951 A2 19991208; EP 0962951 A3 20000913; EP 0962951 B1 20040218; AU 3318599 A 19991216; AU 756777 B2 20030123; CN 1158687 C 20040721; CN 1238543 A 19991215; DE 19824871 A1 19991209; ES 2216375 T3 20041016; JP 4408989 B2 20100203; JP H11353991 A 19991224; KR 100612629 B1 20060814; KR 20000005894 A 20000125; TR 9901257 A2 20000121; TR 9901257 A3 20000121; US 6064294 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100529

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100528

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100528

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20101230

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100528

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080529

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216375 T3

2004-05-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040322

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908551 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2004-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021008

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2001-05-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010216

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI