Global patent index - EP 0963008 A3

EP 0963008 A3 2001-04-18 - A connector and a cap therefor

Title (en)

A connector and a cap therefor

Title (de)

Ein Verbinder und eine Abdeckung dafür

Title (fr)

Un connecteur et un couvercle associé

Publication

EP 0963008 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109391 A

Priority

  • JP 15607598 A
  • JP 6196999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963008A2] To provide a cap capable of preventing the deformation and breakage of tabs in a hood-less type male connector. A cap 3 is integrally made of a synthetic resin, and a cap main body 12 for surrounding tabs projecting from the front end surface of a connector housing 1 is formed at a front part of the cap 3. Behind the cap main body 12 is formed an engaging portion 11 for engaging the cap 3 with the connector housing 1. The engaging portion 11 is comprised of a tubular portion 11A to be mounted on a front end portion of the connector housing 1 and a pair of elastic pieces 11B extending from the left and right side walls of the tubular portion 11A. Further, retainer protecting ribs 16 project upward and downward from a rear end of the tubular portion 11A so as to prevent retainers 8 in their standby positions from shifting to their locking positions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/42 (2006.01); H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/516 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/516 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01R 13/4361 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963008 A2 19991208; EP 0963008 A3 20010418; EP 0963008 B1 20080319; CN 1171358 C 20041013; CN 1238580 A 19991215; DE 69935145 D1 20070329; DE 69935145 T2 20071122; DE 69938376 D1 20080430; DE 69938376 T2 20090402; EP 1100156 A1 20010516; EP 1100156 B1 20070214; JP 2000058190 A 20000225; JP 3387438 B2 20030317

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2009-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080619

2008-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69938376

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040513

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990624

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI