Global Patent Index - EP 0963011 A3

EP 0963011 A3 2001-01-24 - Safety socket with lockable shutter

Title (en)

Safety socket with lockable shutter

Title (de)

Schutzkontaktsteckdose mit verriegelbarem Klappdeckel

Title (fr)

Prise de sécurité avec un couvercle de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0963011 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121543 A

Priority

DE 19824807 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963011A2] The socket has a housing (11) and a hinged lid (13) that can be locked in its closed position to prevent the unauthorized drawing of current. A mechanical combination lock (17) mounted in the lid is accessible from the outside to set a number combination. The hinged lid can be released for opening by the combination lock when a suitable combination of numbers is set.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/639; H01R 13/447

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/447 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01R 13/639 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963011 A2 19991208; EP 0963011 A3 20010124; DE 19824807 A1 19991209; NO 992560 A 19991206; NO 992560 D0 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-12-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI