Global Patent Index - EP 0963168 B1

EP 0963168 B1 2001-03-21 - CLEANING DEVICE FOR A DRY SHAVER

Title (en)

CLEANING DEVICE FOR A DRY SHAVER

Title (de)

REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR RASOIR A SEC

Publication

EP 0963168 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98904146 A

Priority

  • DE 19705975 A
  • EP 9800418 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19705975A1] The invention relates to a cleaning device (RV) to clean the cutting head (SK) of a dry shaver (TR), comprising a housing (1), a holding device (2), a cleaning liquid receptacle (3), a filter (4), a pumping device (6) driven by a motor (5), said pumping device having a feed pipe (7) leading to a cleaning tank (8), and a cleaning liquid discharge (9) from the cleaning tank (8) to the cleaning liquid receptacle (3). The cleaning liquid receptacle (3) is placed along with an integrated filter (4) below the cleaning tank (8). The pumping device (6) can be coupled to the inner chamber (10) of the filter (4) and the cleaning liquid (11) can flow back from the feed pipe (7) through the filter (4) into the cleaning liquid receptacle (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 27/46; B26B 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 27/46 (2006.01); B26B 19/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 27/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19705975 A1 19980820; DE 19705975 C2 20000330; AT 199817 T 20010415; AU 6213498 A 19980908; CN 1149948 C 20040519; CN 1244101 A 20000209; DK 0963168 T3 20010723; EP 0963168 A1 19991215; EP 0963168 B1 20010321; HK 1022819 A1 20041217; JP 2001512338 A 20010821; JP 4077885 B2 20080423; US 6305391 B1 20011023; WO 9835582 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170103

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100126

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-09-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100131

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800563 20010426

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199817 T 20010415

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000511

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990612

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL