Global Patent Index - EP 0963252 B1

EP 0963252 B1 2002-09-25 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING AND OPERATING AN INSTALLATION SUCH AS A HAMMER CRUSHER TO CRUSH RECYCLABLE WASTE MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARGING AND OPERATING AN INSTALLATION SUCH AS A HAMMER CRUSHER TO CRUSH RECYCLABLE WASTE MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BESCHICKEN UND BETREIBEN EINER ANLAGE WIE HAMMERBRECHER ZUM ZERKLEINERN VON RECYCELBAREN ALT-GÜTERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CHARGER ET FAIRE FONCTIONNER UNE INSTALLATION TELLE QU'UN CONCASSEUR A MARTEAUX ARTICULES POUR BROYER DES MATERIAUX USES RECYCLABLES

Publication

EP 0963252 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98913525 A

Priority

  • DE 9800568 W
  • DE 19708185 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19708185A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for charging and operating an installation such as a hammer crusher to crush recyclable waste materials, wherein said waste materials (4) are drawn in by at least one driven roller (2, 6), they are fed for crushing in substantially homogeneous quantities, and data is collected during the charging and crushing process in order to obtain and regulate operating parameters for the feeding of waste material and for an optimized energy consumption and operational crushing process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 19/12; B02C 13/286

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/286 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/0062 (2013.01); B02C 13/286 (2013.01); B02C 2013/28663 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19708185 A1 19980903; DE 19708185 C2 20020711; AT 224771 T 20021015; DK 0963252 T3 20030127; EP 0963252 A1 19991215; EP 0963252 B1 20020925; ES 2184247 T3 20030401; JP 2001513014 A 20010828; WO 9837969 A1 19980903

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180225

2018-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 224771 T

- Effective date: 20180226

2018-03-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180225

2018-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2018-03-05 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180226

2018-02-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180225

2018-02-26 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59805692

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-21 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: METSO MINERALS (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), SAMENVOEGEN; FORMER OWNER NAME: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

- Effective date: 20150517

2016-09-14 [REG NL HC] CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S)

- Owner name: METSO GERMANY GMBH; DE

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), VERANDERING VAN NAAM VAN DE EIGENAAR(S); FORMER OWNER NAME: METSO MINERALS (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20160517

2016-04-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: METSO GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH, 40231 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59805692

2016-04-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805692

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805692

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59805692

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0963252E

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184247 T3

2003-02-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021226

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805692 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224771 T 20021015

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: METSO LINDEMANN GMBH

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990817

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE