Global Patent Index - EP 0963282 B1

EP 0963282 B1 2001-12-19 - DEVICE FOR PRECISION CUTTING OF THIN SHEET MATERIAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR PRECISION CUTTING OF THIN SHEET MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUM FEINSCHNEIDEN VON DÜNNEM BLATTGUT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUPE PRECISE D'UN MATERIAU EN FEUILLE MINCE

Publication

EP 0963282 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98910809 A

Priority

  • FR 9800346 W
  • FR 9702267 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2759620A1] The invention concerns a device characterised in that it consists of a cutting blade (1) hinged in pendulum fashion on a support (2) and combined with means (5) permanently maintaining it at a constant angle ( alpha ) relative to a plastic sheath (G) formed of a film; the cutting blade only cutting the top film (G1) of the sheath when it is moved, by the formation of a bulge (b) on said top film.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 3/08; B26D 7/26; B65B 9/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/04 (2006.01); B26D 3/08 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B31B 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26D 1/045 (2013.01); B26D 3/085 (2013.01); B31B 70/14 (2017.08); B31B 70/16 (2017.08); B31B 70/81 (2017.08); B31B 2155/00 (2017.08); B31B 2155/003 (2017.08); B31B 2160/10 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2759620 A1 19980821; FR 2759620 B1 19990507; AU 6504998 A 19980909; DE 69803042 D1 20020131; EP 0963282 A1 19991215; EP 0963282 B1 20011219; WO 9836882 A1 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69803042 20020131

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990706

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT