Global Patent Index - EP 0963334 B1

EP 0963334 B1 2001-05-02 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FOLDING SHEET PILES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FOLDING SHEET PILES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FALZEN VON BLATTSTAPELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE DE PILES DE FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0963334 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910647 A

Priority

  • DE 19706517 A
  • EP 9800771 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19706517A1] The invention relates to a method for folding sheet piles, which may consist of one or more sheets, in which the sheets may have different folding resistances. This method ensues by means of chronologically successive, cyclic feeding, consisting of movement phases and pauses, of a plurality of sheet piles to the folding equipment. In this method, a pile-folding resistance is first of all determined for a particular sheet pile, from at least the number and/or the folding resistance of the individual sheets constituting the sheet pile. The sheet pile in question is then folded, the folding equipment's speed in folding said sheet pile being guided by the pile-folding resistance determined for this particular sheet pile. In each case, this guiding of the folding speed of the folding equipment ensues during the movement pauses in the cyclic feeding. In the case of a reduction in folding speed, the movement pause is extended for the folding of the next sheet pile that is to be folded, should the necessary folding speed reduction not be achieved during the normal movement pause in the cyclic feeding. Conversely, in the case of an increase in folding speed, depending on the time requisites, either the movement pause is extended for folding the next sheet pile, should the necessary folding speed increase not be achieved during the normal movement pause of the cyclic feeding, or the movement pause is not extended, even though the necessary folding speed increase is not achieved during the normal movement pause.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/00 (2006.01); B65H 45/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/12 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2515/30 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02
  2. B65H 2515/30 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19706517 A1 19980827; CA 2265932 A1 19980827; CA 2265932 C 20021029; EP 0963334 A1 19991215; EP 0963334 B1 20010502; ES 2158670 T3 20010901; JP 2000512964 A 20001003; JP 3269633 B2 20020325; US 6196959 B1 20010306; WO 9837005 A1 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110212

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110212

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800668

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-10-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158670 T3

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800668 20010607

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991210

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981116

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE