Global Patent Index - EP 0963356 A4

EP 0963356 A4 2000-06-14 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REDUCING BREAKAGE OF FIBERS DRAWN FROM BLANKS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REDUCING BREAKAGE OF FIBERS DRAWN FROM BLANKS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM REDUZIEREN DES BRECHENS VON FASERN GEZOGEN VON VORFORMEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE LA FRACTURE DES FIBRES ETIREES A PARTIR D'EBAUCHES

Publication

EP 0963356 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97910815 A

Priority

  • US 9718041 W
  • US 2931896 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818733A1] A fiber preform (20) is contaminated with contaminates such as silicon nitride or silicon carbide. The preform is then held in a chamber (10) with a reducing gas (29) being introduced into the chamber. The reducing gas prevents the contaminates from being oxidized. If the contaminates were oxidized, the strengh of the final fiber would be reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 37/027; C03B 37/012; C03B 37/014

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/00 (2006.01); C03B 37/012 (2006.01); C03B 37/014 (2006.01); C03B 37/027 (2006.01); C03B 37/029 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/01202 (2013.01); C03B 37/01446 (2013.01); C03B 37/0146 (2013.01); C03B 37/027 (2013.01); C03B 37/029 (2013.01); C03B 2205/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0567961 A1 19931103 - CORNING INC [US]
  • [YA] US 5059229 A 19911022 - BLANKENSHIP MICHAEL G [US], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 558 25 October 1994 (1994-10-25)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 39 17 February 1983 (1983-02-17)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 324 19 December 1985 (1985-12-19)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 184 30 July 1985 (1985-07-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 20 20 January 1992 (1992-01-20)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 198 7 April 1994 (1994-04-07)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 17, no. 303 10 June 1993 (1993-06-10)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 9 30 September 1996 (1996-09-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 492 26 October 1990 (1990-10-26)
  • See also references of WO 9818733A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818733 A1 19980507; AU 4809597 A 19980522; AU 734480 B2 20010614; CA 2267970 A1 19980507; EP 0963356 A1 19991215; EP 0963356 A4 20000614; JP 2001507663 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031002

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORNING INCORPORATED

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORNING INCORPORATED

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

2000-06-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 03B 37/027 A, 7C 03B 37/012 B, 7C 03B 37/014 B

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990524

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL