Global Patent Index - EP 0963381 A4

EP 0963381 A4 2001-04-18 - HYDRODYNAMIC ELECTROPROCESSING OF SOLUBLE CONDUCTING POLYMERS

Title (en)

HYDRODYNAMIC ELECTROPROCESSING OF SOLUBLE CONDUCTING POLYMERS

Title (de)

HYDRODYNAMISCHE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE POLYMERISATION VON LÖSLICHEN LEITFÄHIGEN POLYMEREN

Title (fr)

POLYMERISATION ELECTROCHIMIQUE HYDRODYNAMIQUE DE POLYMERES ELECTROCONDUCTEURS SOLUBLES

Publication

EP 0963381 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98905152 A

Priority

  • AU 9800133 W
  • AU PO538397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838224A1] The present invention provides a process for preparing a soluble conductive polymer comprising the step of electrochemically polymerising a monomer and/or an oligomer, or two or more different monomers and/or oligomers, or derivatives thereof, in an electrolytic cell comprising monomer and/or oligomer solution, an electrolyte and an electrode assembly, wherein the monomer and/or oligomer solution is in a hydrodynamic relationship with respect to said electrode assembly. Also provided is an electrochemical cell and an apparatus for hydrodynamic processing of soluble electroconductive polymers as well as soluble conductive polymers prepared by the process disclosed herein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 2/58; C08G 61/12; C08G 73/06; C08G 75/00; C25B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/58 (2006.01); C08G 61/12 (2006.01); C08G 73/00 (2006.01); C08G 85/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C25B 3/10 (2006.01); H01B 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 61/124 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2134125 A 19840808 - LUBRIZOL ENTERPRISES INC
  • [A] EP 0229993 A2 19870729 - POLAROID CORP [US]
  • [X] ZHOU D ET AL: "Electrochemically controlled transport in a dual conducting polymer membrane system", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, vol. 98, no. 1, 13 January 1995 (1995-01-13), pages 173 - 176, XP004041489, ISSN: 0376-7388
  • [A] ZHAO H ET AL: "EFFECT OF THE COUNTERION EMPLOYED DURING SYNTHESIS ON THE PROPERTIES OF POLYPYRROLE MEMBRANES", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE SCIENCE,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBL.COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, vol. 87, no. 1/02, 23 February 1994 (1994-02-23), pages 47 - 56, XP000492307, ISSN: 0376-7388
  • See also references of WO 9838224A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838224 A1 19980903; AU PO538397 D0 19970327; EP 0963381 A1 19991215; EP 0963381 A4 20010418; JP 2001513126 A 20010828; NZ 337978 A 20001027

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030618

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 08F 2/58 A, 7C 08G 73/06 B, 7C 08G 75/00 B, 7C 25B 3/00 B, 7C 08G 61/12 B

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990928

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE