Global Patent Index - EP 0963454 B1

EP 0963454 B1 2002-12-11 - METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE BY POWDER INJECTION MOLDING

Title (en)

METHOD OF MAKING CEMENTED CARBIDE BY POWDER INJECTION MOLDING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON ZEMENTIERTEM CARBID DURCH SPRITZGIESSEN VON PULVER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARBURE FRITTE PAR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION DE POUDRES

Publication

EP 0963454 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97910662 A

Priority

  • SE 9701715 W
  • SE 9603936 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9818973A1] The present invention relates to a method of making a sintered body comprising one or more hard constituents in a binder phase by injection molding technique comprising wet milling of a powder mixture containing powders forming the hard constituents and binder phase, drying said milled powder mixture, mixing said powder mixture with organic binder, waxes and surfactant into a feedstock, molding the feedstock into bodies of desired shape in a conventional plastic molding machine, removing the binder from said bodies and sintering. If the surfactant is introduced already during the milling operation the level of porosity in bodies is significantly reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 29/00; C22C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/10 (2006.01); C04B 35/628 (2006.01); C22C 1/05 (2006.01); C22C 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/051 (2013.01); B22F 3/225 (2013.01); C22C 29/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9818973 A1 19980507; AT 229574 T 20021215; DE 69717861 D1 20030123; DE 69717861 T2 20030508; EP 0963454 A1 19991215; EP 0963454 B1 20021211; JP 2001507075 A 20010529; SE 9603936 D0 19961025

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-11-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717861

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101015

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101014

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101014

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101014

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB

- Free text: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB# #811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE) -TRANSFER TO- SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB# #811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE)

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091013

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB

- Free text: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE) -TRANSFER TO- SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE)

2005-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB

- Free text: SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG (PUBL)##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE) -TRANSFER TO- SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY HB##811 81 SANDVIKEN (SE)

2005-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-10-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717861 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229574 T 20021215

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020422

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990215

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE