Global Patent Index - EP 0963469 B1

EP 0963469 B1 2002-12-11 - RAPIER LOOM

Title (en)

RAPIER LOOM

Title (de)

GREIFERWEBMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A TISSER A RAPIERES

Publication

EP 0963469 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910712 A

Priority

  • BE 9700165 A
  • EP 9800988 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9838366A1] A rapier loom has a plurality of guiding means (28) for guiding rapier bands (1, 2). The guiding means have two rows of guiding elements (35, 36) with two guiding surfaces (37, 38) associated to the bottom side of the rapier bands. The guiding elements (35, 36) are oriented relative to the bottom side of the rapier band (1, 2) such that they form, at the side facing the weaving reed (13), obtuse angles (B, B', C, C') with the bottom side of the rapier band.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/277 (2013.01); D03D 47/272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9838366 A1 19980903; BE 1010943 A3 19990302; DE 59806626 D1 20030123; EP 0963469 A1 19991215; EP 0963469 B1 20021211; ES 2186138 T3 20030501; US 6276403 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-10-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PICANOL, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PICANOL N.V., IEPER, BE

- Document: DE 59806626

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-10-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806626

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

- Effective date: 20120814

2012-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806626

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE RUFF, WILHELM, BEIER, DAUSTER &, DE

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110221

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806626

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110220

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PICANOL N.V.

- Free text: PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE) -TRANSFER TO- PICANOL N.V.#POLENLAAN 3-7#8900 IEPER (BE)

2007-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186138 T3

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806626 20030123

2002-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO G. PETSCHNER

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI