Global Patent Index - EP 0963530 A4

EP 0963530 A4 2000-08-16 - INTEGRATED FILLING, DISPENSING AND CONTENTS INDICATION UNIT FOR LIQUEFIED GAS TANK

Title (en)

INTEGRATED FILLING, DISPENSING AND CONTENTS INDICATION UNIT FOR LIQUEFIED GAS TANK

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE FÜLL-, VERTEILUNGS- UND INHALTSANZEIGE FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGGASTANK

Title (fr)

UNITE D'INDICATION INTEGREE DE REMPLISSAGE, DE DISTRIBUTION ET DE CONTENU POUR RESEVOIR DE GAZ LIQUIFIE

Publication

EP 0963530 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97948657 A

Priority

  • AU 9700883 W
  • AU PO437096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828568A1] Apparatus is disclosed forming part of a liquefied gas tank, in which are integrated means to control replenishment of the contents of said tank (2, 3), means to automatically terminate replenishment flow at a designed percentage of total tank contents, means to control dispensing of the contents from said tank (4, 12, 21), means to generate an indication of the contents of said tank (13), and means to protect said tank against excessive internal pressure (20), said integrated means being all incorporated into or attached to a single, compact block (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/00; F17C 13/02; F17C 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/00 (2006.01); F17C 13/02 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/02 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0329 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0332 (2013.01); F17C 2221/035 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2223/033 (2013.01); F17C 2250/0413 (2013.01); F17C 2260/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828568 A1 19980702; AU 7874598 A 19980717; AU PO437096 D0 19970123; EP 0963530 A1 19991215; EP 0963530 A4 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUGAS TECHNOLOGIES PTY LTD

2000-08-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STM AUTO GAS TANKS PTY. LTD.

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IE IT NL