Global Patent Index - EP 0963592 B1

EP 0963592 B1 2001-12-12 - MOTOR DRIVE

Title (en)

MOTOR DRIVE

Title (de)

MOTORANTRIEB

Title (fr)

MOTEUR D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 0963592 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98901952 A

Priority

  • DE 19707528 A
  • EP 9800092 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19707528C1] The invention relates to a motor-drive position indicator for actuating a sequence shift, a change-over switch or a moving coil. To achieve this, a first circular scale is provided with symbols arranged thereon. Said symbols are allocated to each individual switching stage involved when changing from one motor-drive working position to another. The first scale is swept by a first pointer which rotates at 360 DEG each time switching occurs. A second circular scale is also provided with symbols arranged thereon. Said symbols are allocated to each possible working position of the sequence shift or other. The second scale is also swept by a pointer. The second pointer performs a rotational movement around an angle corresponding to the distance between two adjacent symbols on the second scale each time that switching occurs. Trailing pointers are arranged on both sides of the second pointer in such a way that one of them is pulled along according to the direction of rotation when the second pointer rotates. Both trailing pointers thus indicate the actual control range which is switched.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19707528 C1 19980813; AT 210885 T 20011215; AU 5862598 A 19980918; BG 103579 A 20000229; BG 63790 B1 20021229; BR 9807608 A 20000222; BR 9807608 B1 20100921; CA 2282420 A1 19980903; CA 2282420 C 20060418; CN 1065066 C 20010425; CN 1239582 A 19991222; CZ 297425 B6 20061213; CZ 9903001 A3 19991215; EP 0963592 A1 19991215; EP 0963592 B1 20011212; ES 2165145 T3 20020301; HU 0000971 A2 20000828; HU 0000971 A3 20020328; JP 2001513252 A 20010828; JP 3819442 B2 20060906; KR 100457039 B1 20041110; KR 20000075592 A 20001226; PL 192863 B1 20061229; PL 335303 A1 20000410; RO 120104 B1 20050830; RU 2199787 C2 20030227; US 6234106 B1 20010522; WO 9838662 A1 19980903

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150110

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150110

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150109

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150801

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150109

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802438

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070109

2005-12-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165145 T3

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802438 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210885 T 20011215

2001-07-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOTOR DRIVE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990331

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE