Global patent index - EP 0963714 A3

EP 0963714 A3 2001-04-18 - Alarm device

Title (en)

Alarm device

Title (de)

Alarmanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif avertisseur

Publication

EP 0963714 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105711 A

Priority

JP 16551398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963714A2] An antitheft alarm device has an electric circuit 21 for generation of audible alarm and a supporting mechanism 42 for a flexible cord 6 formed between an upper and lower face plates 2, 3. The circuit 21 has a switch 26 comprising a stationary terminal 35 and a movable terminal 34 biased by a spring to be engaged with the stationary terminal 35. The flexible cord 6 detachably held by the mechanism 42 normally maintains the movable terminal 34 to be disengaged with the stationary terminal 35. After the cord 6 is detached, the movable terminal 34 engages with the stationary terminal 35 and consequently the audible alarm is generated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/24; G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963714 A2 19991215; EP 0963714 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011002

2002-02-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI