Global Patent Index - EP 0963717 A3

EP 0963717 A3 2002-09-18 - Height adjustable underframe

Title (en)

Height adjustable underframe

Title (de)

HÖHENVERSTELLBARES UNTERGESTELL

Title (fr)

Piètement réglable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0963717 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99610033 A

Priority

DK 72098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963717A2] This invention concerns a height-adjustable underframe for a table or a similar work platform, said underframe (1) comprising a cross-beam (10) with at least two telescopically adjustable legs (2), a mechanically-driven movement arrangement (20) to which cords are connected which run over cord pulleys in the underframe and the legs (2), and are arranged to work between a lower leg part (3) and at least one upper leg part (5). According to the invention, the mechanically-driven movement arrangement (20) comprises a toothed wheel (25) in engagement with a toothed element (26), where a compression spring element (30) co-operates with the toothed element (26) for the displacement of this in the longitudinal direction of the cross-beam (10) for the adjustment of the height of the legs (2), in that a first and a second cord (40 and 41 respectively) are secured to an end (29) of the toothed element (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/12 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963717 A2 19991215; EP 0963717 A3 20020918; DK 72098 A 19991130

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI