Global Patent Index - EP 0963724 A3

EP 0963724 A3 2001-01-10 - Displaying watchstraps

Title (en)

Displaying watchstraps

Title (de)

Präsentationsvorrichtung für Uhrarmbänder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de présentation de bracelets de montre

Publication

EP 0963724 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304617 A

Priority

GB 9812798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963724A2] A watchstrap display stand assembly comprises a display stand, a plurality of first watchstrap halves mounted in a holder (3A) of the stand and a plurality of second watchstrap halves mounted in a holder (3B) of the stand. The watchstrap halves are arranged such that each of the first watchstrap halves is positioned in spaced relationship to a respective one of the second watchstrap halves in a manner similar to or substantially the same as when the watchstrap halves are fastened to a watch (W). Each first watchstrap half together with its respective second watchstrap half defines a pair of watchstrap halves for forming respective parts of the same watchstrap. A user can place a watch (W) in the gap between a pair of watchstrap halves and thereby see how the watch (W) looks with that pair of watchstrap halves. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 2465013 A 19490322 - RALPH EPSTEIN

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963724 A2 19991215; EP 0963724 A3 20010110; GB 2338331 A 19991215; GB 9812798 D0 19980812

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI