Global Patent Index - EP 0963802 A3

EP 0963802 A3 2001-04-18 - Perforating press with drive system for one punch

Title (en)

Perforating press with drive system for one punch

Title (de)

Perforierpresse mit einzelstempelsteuerung

Title (fr)

Presse à perforer avec système d'entrainement d'un poinçon unique

Publication

EP 0963802 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110929 A

Priority

DE 19825843 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963802A2] The press contains top and bottom work tools (7, 8) which can be moved towards and away from each other, work tool parts (16, 17) mounted on the top tool (7) being switchable between active and passive positions. At least work tool part is provided with one or more locking device (31, 32) to fix it in the active position. A load relief device (51) is used to introduce the work tool part into the active position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/22 (2006.01); B21D 28/24 (2006.01); B26F 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/246 (2013.01); B26F 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963802 A2 19991215; EP 0963802 A3 20010418; CZ 9902029 A3 19991215; DE 19825843 A1 19991216; DE 19825843 C2 20030320

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021009

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI