Global Patent Index - EP 0963814 A3

EP 0963814 A3 2000-08-16 - Ratchet wrench

Title (en)

Ratchet wrench

Title (de)

Ratschenschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé à cliquet

Publication

EP 0963814 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104658 A

Priority

JP 463598 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963814A2] A ratchet wrench (3) for turning bolts and nuts disposed in narrow or inaccessible places. The ratchet wrench is rotatably attached to an end (1a) of an operation rod (1). The ratchet wrench comprises a weight (21) attached to the operation rod, the weight being slidable lengthwise along the operation rod, the operation rod being provided at a portion thereof in front of the weight with a front weight receiving portion (25) against which the weight is struck. Alternatively, the operation rod may be provided at a portion thereof in the rear of the weight with a rear weight receiving portion (27) against which the weight is struck. Also, the operation rod may be provided with both the front weight receiving portion and the rear weight receiving portion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 13/46; B25B 13/48; B25B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/46 (2006.01); B25B 13/48 (2006.01); B25B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 19/00 (2013.01); B25B 13/463 (2013.01); B25B 13/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963814 A2 19991215; EP 0963814 A3 20000816; CN 1144656 C 20040407; CN 1238255 A 19991215; TW 377312 B 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060314

2005-11-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A COMBINATION OF A RATCHET WRENCH AND AN OPERATION ROD

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI