Global Patent Index - EP 0963815 A3

EP 0963815 A3 2001-05-02 - Electro-hydraulic device for crimping pipe connections

Title (en)

Electro-hydraulic device for crimping pipe connections

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulische Vorrichtung zum Verpressen von Rohrverbindungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif électro-hydraulique pour le sertissage de raccords de tuyaux

Publication

EP 0963815 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109123 A

Priority

DE 19826110 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963815A2] The arrangement has a motor part with a cylindrical housing body (1.4) cont. a drive piston and with a press jaw attachment (1.5) on one end, a handle (1.1) with a trigger switch (1.2), and control and supply lines connected to the remote generator part cont. a controlled hydraulic circuit. The housing body has a handle above the center of load of the motor part. The trigger switch is integrated in the handle with control and monitoring elements (1.3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 39/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963815 A2 19991215; EP 0963815 A3 20010502; EP 0963815 B1 20040721; AT 271445 T 20040815; DE 19826110 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070508

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070508

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060515

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060505

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-05-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909989 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

2004-07-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040721

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT NL

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LEVERBERG, SIEGFRIED

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEVERBERG, SIEGFRIED

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT NL

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI