Global Patent Index - EP 0963852 B1

EP 0963852 B1 2001-05-16 - A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes.

Title (en)

A method of printing in a device for direct electrostatic printing comprising a printhead structure with deflection electrodes and a means for electrically controlling said deflection electrodes.

Title (de)

Druckverfahren und Steuerung für Druckkopf mit Ablenkelektroden zum direkten elektrostatischen Drucken

Title (fr)

Méthode d'impression et contrôle pour une tête d'impression avec électrodes de déviation pour l'impression électrostatique directe

Publication

EP 0963852 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99200479 A

Priority

  • EP 99200479 A
  • EP 98201965 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963852A1] A device for direct electrostatic printing with an addressability AD in dots per cm having a means for delivering charged toner particles coupled to a means for applying a first electric potential (DC1) and a means (DC4) for applying an electric field between the means for delivering toner particles and an image receiving substrate (108). The electric potential difference ¦DC4-DC1¦ creates a flow of the charged toner particles (104) towards the substrate. In the flow of toner particles a printhead structure is placed having printing apertures, control electrodes associated therewith and deflection electrodes. Between the printhead structure and the image receiving substrate, a gap, dB, is left so that ((¦DC4-DC1¦)/dB) = R1 1.5 V/ mu m. The deflection electrodes are coupled to a voltage source for applying a varying voltage to the deflection electrodes. Preferably that varying voltage has a peak to peak value, Vp, so that Vp/R1 > 250 mu m.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/415

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/415 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/4155 (2013.01); G03G 2217/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0945275 A2 19990929 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963852 A1 19991215; EP 0963852 B1 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900106 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-16 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-05-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI