Global Patent Index - EP 0963887 A3

EP 0963887 A3 2000-10-04 - Method and device for detecting the occupation of a seat in a vehicle

Title (en)

Method and device for detecting the occupation of a seat in a vehicle

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Sitzbelegungserkennung eines Fahrzeuges

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour détecter l'occupation d'un siège dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 0963887 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109296 A

Priority

DE 19826287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963887A2] The method is implemented with an optical transmitter (4), a number of optical conductors (6) associated with the transmitter mounted in, on or around the seat and further light conductors (7) in the light path of a first light conductor, whereby there is a definite relationship between the first and second group of light conductors and each conductor in the second group has an associated optical detector (13). The transmitter transmits and optical beam that is coupled into the first optical conductors, that emit the beam to be collected by the second group of conductors if there is no obstruction in the light path. The light passes to the detectors and is evaluated to determine the seat contour which is passed to the vehicle occupant safety system. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for detecting seat occupancy in a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 21/32; B60R 21/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/01 (2006.01); B60R 21/015 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/01534 (2014.10); B60N 2/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963887 A2 19991215; EP 0963887 A3 20001004; EP 0963887 B1 20030226; DE 19826287 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080531

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-05-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904355 P 20030403

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020429

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60R 21/32 A, 7B 60R 21/01 B

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI