Global patent index - EP 0963896 A3

EP 0963896 A3 2000-08-30 - Method and device for checking the integrity of the composition of rail vehicles

Title (en)

Method and device for checking the integrity of the composition of rail vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Integritätsprüfung eines schienengebundenen Fahrzeugverbands

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la vérification de l'intégrité d'une formation de véhicules sur rails

Publication

EP 0963896 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99440121 A

Priority

DE 19826090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0963896A2] The method involves exerting a pressure pulse on a rail from a first arrangement (DIS) mounted on a vehicle in the train; recording the pressure pulse propagating in the rail with a second arrangement (DIG) in the vehicle; evaluating the detected pulse to determine from how many axes of the vehicle the pressure pulse was reflected. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for checking the integrity of a railway train.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 15/00; B61L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 1/14 (2006.01); B61L 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/0054 (2013.01); B61L 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0963896 A2 19991215; EP 0963896 A3 20000830; DE 19826090 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030408

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI