Global Patent Index - EP 0964090 A3

EP 0964090 A3 2000-09-06 - Cleaning cloth

Title (en)

Cleaning cloth

Title (de)

Reinigungstuch

Title (fr)

Tissu de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0964090 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109983 A

Priority

DE 29810240 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964090A2] The cleaning cloth has a basic woven structure (1) with pile tufts projecting on both sides. The piles are neps locked into the woven structure (1), with their ends forming fibre tufts to give the pile structure on both sides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/00; A47L 13/16; A47L 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/16 (2006.01); D03D 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/16 (2013.01); D03D 27/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810240 U1 19980924; EP 0964090 A2 19991215; EP 0964090 A3 20000906; US 6305431 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIRMES IN-TEX GMBH & CO. KG.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI