Global patent index - EP 0964105 A3

EP 0964105 A3 2000-05-03 - Flushing cistern for a WC

Title (en)

Flushing cistern for a WC

Title (de)

Spülkasten für ein WC-Klosett

Title (fr)

Chasse d'eau pour un WC

Publication

EP 0964105 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810134 A

Priority

CH 105898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964105A2] The cistern contains a drainage valve with actuator and a holding-down part (6) for the valve. The part is supported via a yoke (15) at the upper end, on a bridge-shaped holder (5) for the valve actuator. The holding-down part has elements for height adjustment. The yoke may be height-adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29902386 U1 19990617; EP 0964105 A2 19991215; EP 0964105 A3 20000503; PL 332111 A1 19991122

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2001-01-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000613

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI