Global Patent Index - EP 0964108 A3

EP 0964108 A3 2000-11-08 - Cover

Title (en)

Cover

Title (de)

Verschalung

Title (fr)

Habillage

Publication

EP 0964108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890155 A

Priority

AT 101098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964108A2] The cladding comprises several sound-absorbing wall parts (1, 2) connected together along complementing edge areas. One edge area of the wall parts is shaped as a profile open in a direction pointing away from the device to be sound-proofed whilst the opposite edge area has a profile for fitting into same. The shaped areas of the edges of the wall parts lie substantially inside the thickness of the wall parts including insulation. The wall parts can be made from sheet metal plates with the profiled areas formed by folds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/61; E04B 1/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/16 (2006.01); E04B 1/82 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/8218 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964108 A2 19991215; EP 0964108 A3 20001108; EP 0964108 B1 20021204; AT 229113 T 20021215; AT 406917 B 20001025; AT A101098 A 20000215; CZ 9902080 A3 19991215; DE 59903623 D1 20030116; HU 221780 B1 20030128; HU 9901824 A1 20000428; HU 9901824 D0 19990830; PL 333645 A1 19991220

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 229113 T

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903623

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903623

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903623 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229113 T 20021215

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHEUCH GMBH

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI