Global Patent Index - EP 0964110 A3

EP 0964110 A3 2000-12-27 - Heat and/or sound insulation element for building construction

Title (en)

Heat and/or sound insulation element for building construction

Title (de)

Dämmelement zur Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmung einer Gebäudedachkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Isolation thermique et/ou acoustique pour bâtiment

Publication

EP 0964110 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110201 A

Priority

DE 19826137 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964110A2] The panel (1) has a thick layer of mineral wool fibers (6) adhering to a thin hard backing layer, made of glass fiber or paper. The top surface has a number of narrow grooves or slits (7) in it. The mineral wool may be made from natural stone by a melting and spinning process, and the fibers are lightly compressed together to make a felt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1625 (2013.01); E04B 1/7658 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7683 (2013.01); E04B 2001/7695 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964110 A2 19991215; EP 0964110 A3 20001227; DE 19826137 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020116

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI