Global Patent Index - EP 0964117 A3

EP 0964117 A3 2000-10-04 - Store arrangement

Title (en)

Store arrangement

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Lagern von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de stockage des objets

Publication

EP 0964117 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99111253 A

Priority

DK 9800223 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964117A2] This invention concerns a store arrangement secured against breaking open for use by theft protection of large objects, for example motorcycles, at its normal place of stay. The new by the invention consists of an articulated securing of lock system against breaking open (1) which is used together with a shutting system constructed as an articulated or linked grid cage (19) in which the object, for example motorcycles desired to be protected against theft, is placed within. The grid cage and the securing of lock system against breaking open is constructed in such a way that it is secured against being broken open, as all links and mounting screw bolts are fixed when the securing of the lock system is locked. In order to function, the invention only has to use wall for erection and mounting. The invention has a height preventing the object desied to be protected against theft to be lifted over the grid cage. The invention as a whole is made in a very hard steel material, which only can be broken through with a special cutting tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/00; E04H 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964117 A2 19991215; EP 0964117 A3 20001004; DK 9800223 U3 19981127; DK 9800223 Y6 20010427

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [R18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-07-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021231

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETERSEN, ERIK SCHELDE

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PEDERSEN, AXEL

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JE-AX APS

2000-11-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JE-AX APS

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 6/00 A, 7E 04H 17/14 B

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI