Global Patent Index - EP 0964156 A3

EP 0964156 A3 2000-08-16 - Pump operating process for boiling refrigerants or coolants

Title (en)

Pump operating process for boiling refrigerants or coolants

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Pumpe zur Förderung siedener Kältemittel oder Kälteträger

Title (fr)

Procédé d'opération d'une pompe pour réfrigérants au point d'ébullition

Publication

EP 0964156 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111023 A

Priority

DE 19826291 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964156A2] The method involves supercooling (E5) the coolant or low-temp. medium before feeding it into the pump (P). The supercooling is performed by indirect heat exchange with at least one refrigerating machine. The supercooling can be performed by indirect heat exchange with at least one sub-flow (11') in the coolant circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/00; F25B 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/00 (2006.01); F25B 25/00 (2006.01); F25B 41/00 (2006.01); F25B 1/10 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/00 (2013.01); F04B 49/00 (2013.01); F25B 25/005 (2013.01); F04B 2205/10 (2013.01); F25B 1/10 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 2309/06 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01); F25B 2400/23 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964156 A2 19991215; EP 0964156 A3 20000816; DE 19826291 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI