Global Patent Index - EP 0964160 A3

EP 0964160 A3 2000-02-23 - Liquid ring pump

Title (en)

Liquid ring pump

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsringpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à anneau liquide

Publication

EP 0964160 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110318 A

Priority

DE 19825521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964160A2] The pump (1) has a housing (10) defining a working space containing at least one pump wheel. The wheel is rotated by an electric drive motor (2) and at least one control disc (11), with at least one suction opening (12) and at least one pressure opening (13), cooperating with a side plate (15) for defining a suction space and a pressure space. The housing, the side plate, the suction and pressure connections (18,19) and the control disc are all provided by a single metal casting. The casting has a seating for receiving a seal for the pump wheel drive shaft (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 19/00; F04C 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/00 (2013.01); F01C 21/10 (2013.01); F04C 2230/21 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964160 A2 19991215; EP 0964160 A3 20000223; DE 19825521 A1 20000127; DE 19825521 C2 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NASH-ELMO INDUSTRIES GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI