Global Patent Index - EP 0964161 A3

EP 0964161 A3 2001-04-04 - Fan rotor

Title (en)

Fan rotor

Title (de)

Lüfterrad

Title (fr)

Roue ventilateur

Publication

EP 0964161 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99109194 A

Priority

IT TO980108 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964161A2] A fan in plastic material of motor-driven fan for a motor vehicle cockpit comprising: a first cap-shaped portion (10), integral to a rotor (26) of an electric motor and provided with centred holes (8) for the passage of the shaft of the motor around which rotates the cap itself; a second portion in the shape of a fan wheel (11) which is integrally in rotation with the cap (10), and provided with a series of bladings (17) which are equally orientated and angularly distanced from each other on a circumferential extension; the fan is characterised by the fact that the cap (10) and the fan wheel (11) are two distinct elements provided with respective unmatchable snap coupling means (13, 23) to render them integral in rotation as a single body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/28; F04D 29/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/626 (2013.01); F04D 29/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964161 A2 19991215; EP 0964161 A3 20010404; IT 245852 Y1 20020326; IT TO980108 U1 19991213

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI