Global Patent Index - EP 0964202 A3

EP 0964202 A3 2000-03-15 - Boiler for combustion of wood

Title (en)

Boiler for combustion of wood

Title (de)

Heizkessel zur Verbrennung von Holz

Title (fr)

Chaudière à bois

Publication

EP 0964202 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111305 A

Priority

DE 19826492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964202A2] The wood-fired boiler has a direct feed of primary (9) and secondary (10) air, through channels (4), at the lower end of the filling shaft zone and close to the flames and the ash extraction. The log combustion is concentrated and maintained at the lower end of the filling shaft (3). The filling shaft walls (8) are thin, with a suitable total surface insulation (12), to prevent heavy masses building up in the combustion zone. Charcoal formed at the lower section of the filling shaft is preserved by an airtight closure of the primary air feed (6), to be left in place for an emission-free relighting of the boiler.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23B 5/04; F23B 1/36; F23L 1/00; F23M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23B 60/00 (2006.01); F23L 1/00 (2006.01); F23M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23B 5/04 (2013.01); F23B 1/36 (2013.01); F23B 7/005 (2013.01); F23L 1/00 (2013.01); F23M 5/00 (2013.01); F23G 2209/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964202 A2 19991215; EP 0964202 A3 20000315; CZ 9902098 A3 19991215; DE 19826492 A1 19991216; PL 333731 A1 19991220; SK 77299 A3 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020213

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR LI

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI