Global Patent Index - EP 0964205 A3

EP 0964205 A3 2000-11-02 - Device for fastening lining plates

Title (en)

Device for fastening lining plates

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Befestigen von Auskleidungsplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation de plaques de revêtement

Publication

EP 0964205 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110737 A

Priority

DE 19825546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19825546C1] The anchor pin (7) forms at least two spring-elastic tongues (9,10). On the tongues are formed radial projections (11,12), which snap-engage in the manner of press buttons behind a stop edge (20) connected to the cladding plate (5). The projections form front inclines (15,16), which with the spring-elastic pivoting of the tongues are pushed into the opening of the cladding plate forming the stop edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 5/04; F16B 5/06; F16L 59/12; F27D 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/10 (2006.01); F23M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 37/108 (2013.01); F23M 5/04 (2013.01); F23M 2900/05004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19825546 C1 19990826; CN 1239764 A 19991229; EP 0964205 A2 19991215; EP 0964205 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI