Global Patent Index - EP 0964217 B1

EP 0964217 B1 2003-06-25 - Firing shelf assembly for furnace car

Title (en)

Firing shelf assembly for furnace car

Title (de)

Ofenwagen-Brennregal

Title (fr)

Etagère de cuisson pour chariot de four

Publication

EP 0964217 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106674 A

Priority

  • DE 19816434 A
  • DE 19821635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964217A1] The shelving with support columns (16) provided with pairs of bars (26) carrying beams (28) forming shelves (30) for the products to be fired has each column (16) consists of a number of distance pieces (18, 20) which are stacked on top of one another and are provided with slots for the bars (26). Preferred Features: The distance pieces (18) take the form of shells (20) with polygonal or circular outer and inner contours. The slots in the distance pieces are located in their middle region and have a closed outline. Alternatively they are located in a bottom region of the distance pieces, and have an open bottom. In this case the bars (26) in the slots are supported on top of the distance pieces directly below them. The support columns built up of distance pieces are erected on support feet of a base unit. Plate elements are placed between such support feet and the support columns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 5/0006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964217 A1 19991215; EP 0964217 B1 20030625; PL 186729 B1 20040227; PL 332490 A1 19991025; PT 964217 E 20031031

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051003

2005-04-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): IT PT

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN INDUSTRIEKERAMIK ROEDENTAL GMBH

2000-09-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: IT PT

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990827

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT PT

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI