Global Patent Index - EP 0964220 A3

EP 0964220 A3 2000-03-29 - Box magazine

Title (en)

Box magazine

Title (de)

Stangenmagazin

Title (fr)

Chargeur du type à boîte

Publication

EP 0964220 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111227 A

Priority

DE 29810423 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964220A2] The magazine has a viewing slot (3) in its side which is filled by a panel (4) of transparent material. The inside surface of the panel preferably is in alignment with the inside surface of the side wall. The outside of the wall has a groove or tongue, fitting in a corresponding tongue or groove in the side wall. The magazine itself is preferably made of opaque plastic while the panel is of transparent plastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/65; F41A 9/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/65 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/65 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810423 U1 19980917; AT 314620 T 20060115; DE 59912969 D1 20060202; EP 0964220 A2 19991215; EP 0964220 A3 20000329; EP 0964220 B1 20051228; ES 2255204 T3 20060616

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100610

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100609

2011-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HECKLER & KOCH G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH

- Free text: HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- HECKLER & KOCH GMBH#ALTE STEIGE 7#78727 OBERNDORF (DE)

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255204 T3

2006-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912969 P 20060202

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040722

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI