Global Patent Index - EP 0964372 A3

EP 0964372 A3 2001-03-14 - Game system for playing with medals

Title (en)

Game system for playing with medals

Title (de)

Münzschiebespielgerät

Title (fr)

Machine de jeu à poussoir

Publication

EP 0964372 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304147 A

Priority

JP 18142098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964372A2] To diversify the progress of a game and to properly manage the flows of medals, a medal game system is provided. The game system comprises a container for storing the medal, an escalator for guiding the medal in an aligned state, a mechanism for sending out the medal stored in the container toward the escalator, and a discharge mechanism for flipping the medal in the escalator out through an exit thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/00 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3297 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3216 (2013.01); G07F 17/3276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964372 A2 19991215; EP 0964372 A3 20010314; EP 0964372 B1 20080730; CN 1141158 C 20040310; CN 1239003 A 19991222; DE 69939197 D1 20080911; EP 1638059 A1 20060322; HK 1023431 A1 20081114; JP 2000000374 A 20000107; JP 2981462 B1 19991122; TW 469149 B 20011221

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150527

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151201

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69939197

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2008-11-14 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1023431

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69939197 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONAMI DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT CO., LTD.

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050620

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONAMI CORPORATION

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI