Global Patent Index - EP 0964377 A3

EP 0964377 A3 2000-06-28 - Device for recording a situation of danger in which a person finds himself

Title (en)

Device for recording a situation of danger in which a person finds himself

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Registrierung einer Gefahrensituation, in der sich eine Person befindet

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour régistrer une situation de danger dans laquelle se trouve une personne

Publication

EP 0964377 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250178 A

Priority

DE 19826783 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964377A2] The method involves the person wearing a device with a unit for automatic location of the person's position. There is a transmitter and a receiver in the station, for wireless reception of the signals transmitted by the transmitter, and for evaluation of the signals so that the person can be assisted on raising the alarm. The arrangement includes a digital mini-camera worn at the front of the person that takes at least one image of the attacker, when it is manually or automatically activated. The image is transmitted to the receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00; G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01); G08B 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19695 (2013.01); G08B 13/19621 (2013.01); G08B 13/1966 (2013.01); G08B 25/016 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964377 A2 19991215; EP 0964377 A3 20000628; DE 19826783 C1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-04-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2001-01-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ALTENHOFER, FRANZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ALTENHOFER, FRANZ

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI