Global patent index - EP 0964410 A3

EP 0964410 A3 2000-09-20 - Thick film substance and Manufacturing Process for a Thick Film Structure

Title (en)

Thick film substance and Manufacturing Process for a Thick Film Structure

Title (de)

Dickschichtsubstanz und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Struktur aus einer Dickschichtsubstanz

Title (fr)

Substance à couche épaisse et procédé pour la fabrication d'une structure à couche épaisse

Publication

EP 0964410 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109459 A

Priority

DE 19822033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19822033A1] A thick layer substance contains a reactive organic substance containing chemically reactive components that is cross-linkable with a substrate and the residual components within the substance. A thick layer substance (I) preferably a paste comprises an active component that serves to define the properties of the substance and a flow agent that cause bonding with a substrate to be coated is claimed. (I) contains a reactive organic substance containing chemically reactive components that is cross-linkable with the substrate and the residual components of (I) within the region bounded by the appropriate application of energy. Independent claims are included for: (i) a process for the production of a structure (II) from (I) and a substrate by coating the substrate with (I), selective binding of (I) to the substrate corresponding to the desired structure by localized application of energy and removal of the non-bonded (I) from the substrate; and (ii) a household appliance having a structure (II)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19822033 A1 19991118; EP 0964410 A2 19991215; EP 0964410 A3 20000920

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHUBERT, LARS

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMIDMAYER, GERHARD DIPL.-ING.

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI