Global Patent Index - EP 0964422 A3

EP 0964422 A3 2000-05-24 - Method of manufacturing image forming apparatus

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing image forming apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bilderzeugerungsgeräts

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un appareil de formation d'image

Publication

EP 0964422 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303398 A

Priority

JP 12253098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964422A2] A method of manufacturing an image forming apparatus having an envelope made of members inclusive of a first substrate and a second substrate disposed at a space being set therebetween, image forming means and spacers disposed in the envelope, the spacers maintaining the space, the method comprising the steps of forming a spacer having a desired shape by cutting a spacer base member, and abutting the spacer upon the first and second substrates at non-cut surfaces of the spacer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/24; H01J 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/1339 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 9/30 (2006.01); H01J 1/30 (2006.01); H01J 5/03 (2006.01); H01J 9/18 (2006.01); H01J 9/24 (2006.01); H01J 29/02 (2006.01); H01J 29/86 (2006.01); H01J 29/87 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H04N 5/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/028 (2013.01); H01J 9/185 (2013.01); H01J 9/242 (2013.01); H01J 29/864 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 2201/3165 (2013.01); H01J 2329/864 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8645 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8655 (2013.01); H01J 2329/866 (2013.01); Y10T 225/12 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964422 A2 19991215; EP 0964422 A3 20000524; EP 0964422 B1 20050928; DE 69927434 D1 20060209; DE 69927434 T2 20060622; JP 2001015025 A 20010119; KR 100339801 B1 20020607; KR 100368369 B1 20030124; KR 100388184 B1 20030618; KR 19990088017 A 19991227; KR 20020068998 A 20020828; US 2003124945 A1 20030703; US 2004152391 A1 20040805; US 2007072507 A1 20070329; US 6506087 B1 20030114; US 6712665 B2 20040330; US 7160168 B2 20070109; US 7297039 B2 20071120

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927434

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927434

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927434 P 20060209

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AN IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING IT

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI