Global patent index - EP 0964429 A4

EP 0964429 A4 2001-03-21 - ELECTRODE STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRON EMISSION, DISCHARGE LAMP, AND DISCHARGE LAMP APPARATUS

Title (en)

ELECTRODE STRUCTURE FOR ELECTRON EMISSION, DISCHARGE LAMP, AND DISCHARGE LAMP APPARATUS

Title (de)

ELEKTRODENSTRUKTUR FUR ELEKTRONENEMISSION, ENTLADUNGSLAMPE UND ENTLADUNGSLAMPENAPPARAT

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE D'ELECTRODE POUR EMISSION ELECTRONIQUE, LAMPE A DECHARGE ET APPAREIL A LAMPE A DECHARGE

Publication

EP 0964429 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98963650 A

Priority

  • JP 9806016 W
  • JP 36118197 A
  • JP 8750098 A
  • JP 15627098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964429A1] This is an electron emission electrode structure that can shorten the transition time from glow discharge to arc discharge and, at the same time, stabilise the arc discharge and prevent reduction of electrode life and blackening of the tube inner wall, together with a discharge lamp that uses this electrode structure and a discharge lamp device in which this discharge lamp is installed. It is electron emission electrode structure 3A that is composed of electron emitter 5, made of an aggregate of granules 51, ..., that emits thermal electrons from an exposed surface when heated by a discharge, and a discharge focussing means that is in the close vicinity of, or in contact with, the above exposed surface of electron emitter 5 and focuses the discharge on the above exposed surface, together with discharge lamp 1 that uses electrode structure 3A and discharge lamp device 9 in which discharge lamp 1 is installed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/0672 (2013.01); H01J 61/0677 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 123 (E - 117) 8 July 1982 (1982-07-08)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 087 (E - 108) 25 May 1982 (1982-05-25)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 03 29 March 1996 (1996-03-29)
  • See also references of WO 9934402A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964429 A1 19991215; EP 0964429 A4 20010321; CN 1249063 A 20000329; KR 100327698 B1 20020309; WO 9934402 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR