Global Patent Index - EP 0964484 A3

EP 0964484 A3 2000-12-20 - Two-part electrical connector housing

Title (en)

Two-part electrical connector housing

Title (de)

Zweiteiliges Gehäuse des elektrischen Steckers

Title (fr)

Boîtier électrique en deux parties

Publication

EP 0964484 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200959 A

Priority

DE 19821515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821515A1] The housing for an in line electrical connector has a plug (12) and socket (14). The socket is internally shaped to provide accurate guidance and to ensure that the two parts are correctly oriented. Coding elements (18,20) ensures that the correct parts are coupled together. The top of the plug is formed with a latching element (108) that engages a feature (116) on the socket element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/645

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/645 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/645 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821515 A1 19991125; EP 0964484 A2 19991215; EP 0964484 A3 20001220

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI