Global Patent Index - EP 0964542 A3

EP 0964542 A3 2003-06-25 - Wireless system for broadcasting, receiving and selectively printing packets of information

Title (en)

Wireless system for broadcasting, receiving and selectively printing packets of information

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Funkübertragung, für den Empfang und fürs wahlweise Ausdrucken von Informationspaketen

Title (fr)

Système de diffusion par voie hertzienne, système de réception et système pour imprimer de façon sélective des paquets d'information

Publication

EP 0964542 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304570 A

Priority

  • US 9644498 A
  • US 9582098 A
  • US 9644398 A
  • US 23753399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0964542A2] According to one embodiment of the invention, a system is provided for dispatching one or more packets of information, such as redeemable coupons, messages, appointment reminders, confirmations, tickets, warnings or written packets, to potential recipients of said packets at remote locations. The steps included in such a system are: (1) developing a subscriber directory (10) containing unique identification information for each of said potential recipients; (2) creating a packet to be dispatched to at least one of said recipients; (3) identifying the potential recipients for a particular packet; (4) transmitting said packet through a wireless pager network (7) to a network (80) of printer appliances (82) associated with all of said potential recipients; and (5) receiving and selectively processing and printing only those packets intended to be processed and printed by said appliance. Each printer appliance (82) includes means for receiving said packets of information transmitted by the wireless pager network; means for analyzing said packets to determine whether said packets are intended to be processed and printed by that particular appliance; and means for printing said packets of information. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/12 (2006.01); B41J 29/38 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); H04H 20/72 (2008.01); H04H 60/63 (2008.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H04H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/72 (2013.01); H04H 60/63 (2013.01); H04H 2201/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0964542 A2 19991215; EP 0964542 A3 20030625; CA 2274206 A1 19991211; JP 2000122823 A 20000428; TW 478263 B 20020301

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110104

2009-05-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NCH MARKETING SERVICES, INC.

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060808

2004-04-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-04-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI