Global Patent Index - EP 0964630 B1

EP 0964630 B1 2003-06-25 - TOY FURNITURE WITH TABLE TOP

Title (en)

TOY FURNITURE WITH TABLE TOP

Title (de)

SPIELMÖBEL MIT TISCHPLATTE

Title (fr)

MEUBLE JOUET DOTE D'UN PLATEAU

Publication

EP 0964630 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951836 A

Priority

  • DE 9702861 W
  • DE 19706176 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19706176A1] The invention relates to a piece of toy furniture with a table top which is fastened at two opposite edges to respective support elements wherein the fastening is a pin (3) having a vertical axis. The support elements are pivoted in relation to the table top, around the pin axis (3). The base surfaces of the support elements support the table top (2) in stable manner at any angle, and the edges of the support elements protrude over the table top (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47D 3/00; A47D 11/00; A47D 13/06; A47D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 3/00 (2006.01); A47D 11/00 (2006.01); A47D 13/06 (2006.01); A47D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19706176 A1 19980820; AT 243449 T 20030715; EP 0964630 A1 19991222; EP 0964630 B1 20030625; WO 9835592 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081206

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EICHINGER HARTMUT

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710355 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020327

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL