Global patent index - EP 0964672 A4

EP 0964672 A4 2001-03-21 - COMPOSITION FOR ENHANCING SKIN OR HAIR

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR ENHANCING SKIN OR HAIR

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER HAUT ODER DES HAARES

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR AMELIORER L'ETAT DE LA PEAU OU DES CHEVEUX

Publication

EP 0964672 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97903746 A

Priority

US 9700154 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830198A1] A composition and its use for enhancing the qualities of skin or hair, the composition comprising: (A) a skin-treating compound or a hair-treating compound; (B) an enhancer having structure (I) wherein: X and Y are oxygen, sulfur, or an imino group of the structure =N-R, with the proviso that when Y is the imino group, X is an imino group and when Y is sulfur, X is sulfur or an imino group; A is a group having the structure (a) wherein X and Y are defined; m and n are integers having a value of from 1 to 20 and the sum of m + n is not greater than 25; p is an integer having a value of 0 or 1; q is an integer having a value of 0 or 1; r is an integer having a value of 0 or 1; and R is hydrogen or an alkyl group having from 1 to 6 carbon atoms and may be straight chained or branched; with the proviso that when p, q and r have a value of 0 and Y is oxygen, m + n is at least 11; (C) a carrier; and optionally (D) a cosmetic additive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/42; A61K 7/06; A61K 7/44; A61K 7/48; A61K 31/335; A61K 31/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61K 8/67 (2006.01); A61Q 5/00 (2006.01); A61Q 17/04 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 17/04 (2013.01); A61K 8/4973 (2013.01); A61Q 5/00 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830198 A1 19980716; AU 1823897 A 19980803; AU 731269 B2 20010329; CA 2275971 A1 19980716; CA 2275971 C 20080429; EP 0964672 A1 19991222; EP 0964672 A4 20010321; IL 130663 A 20051218; IL 130663 D0 20000601; JP 2002514203 A 20020514

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025735

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2009-07-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081203

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HSIEH, DEAN

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 7/42 A, 7A 61K 7/44 B, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/335 B, 7A 61K 7/48 B, 7A 61K 7/06 B

2000-03-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONREX PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990727

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE