Global Patent Index - EP 0964694 A4

EP 0964694 A4 2000-09-13 - MUCIN-MEDIATED IMMUNOMODULATION

Title (en)

MUCIN-MEDIATED IMMUNOMODULATION

Title (de)

MUCIN-VERMITTELTE IMMUNOMODULATION

Title (fr)

IMMUNOMODULATION INDUITE PAR LA MUCINE

Publication

EP 0964694 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97946409 A

Priority

  • US 9719784 W
  • US 73826296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817300A1] Disclosed is a method of decreasing or preventing the deleterious effects of cytotoxic T lymphocytes that involves identifying an animal having a non-tumor cell at risk of attack by the animal's cytotoxic T lymphocytes, and providing to the cell a molecule having at least one tandem repeat segment of a mucin. Also disclosed is a method of augmenting the immune response against a tumor cell expressing a mucin, using a composition that binds to the tandem repeat segment of the mucin and blocks the CTL-inhibiting effects of the mucin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 35/26 (2006.01); A61K 35/37 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); C07K 14/4727 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] WO 9503825 A1 19950209 - FINN OLIVERA J [US], et al
  • [A] WO 8805054 A1 19880714 - IMP CANCER RES TECH [GB]
  • [E] WO 9810783 A1 19980319 - BIOMIRA INC [CA], et al
  • [XA] VAN DE WIEL-VAN KEMENADE ELLY ET AL: "Episialin (MUC1) inhibits cytotoxic lymphocyte-target cell interaction.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 151, no. 2, 1993, pages 767 - 776, XP002141253, ISSN: 0022-1767
  • [XA] REDDISH MARK A ET AL: "Pre-immunotherapy serum CA27.29 (MUC-1) mucin level and CD69+ lymphocytes correlate with effects of Theratope sialyl-Tn-KLH cancer vaccine in active specific immunotherapy.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, vol. 42, no. 5, 1996, pages 303 - 309, XP000914873, ISSN: 0340-7004
  • [X] HILKENS J ET AL: "Is episialin/MUC1 involved in breast cancer progression?", CANCER LETTERS, vol. 90, no. 1, 1995, pages 27 - 33, XP000915262, ISSN: 0304-3835
  • [A] DENTON G ET AL: "INDUCTION OF ANTIBODY RESPONSES TO BREAST CARCINOMA ASSOCIATED MUCINS USING SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE CONSTRUCTS AS IMMUNOGENS", CANCER LETTERS,US,NEW YORK, NY, vol. 70, no. 3, 16 July 1993 (1993-07-16), pages 143 - 150, XP002035983, ISSN: 0304-3835
  • [X] GRAHAM R A ET AL: "The polymorphic epithelial mucin: potential as an immunogen for a cancer vaccine", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOTHERAPY,DE,BERLIN, vol. 2, no. 42, 1 January 1996 (1996-01-01), pages 71 - 80, XP002075466, ISSN: 0340-7004
  • [X] PEAT N ET AL: "TISSUE-SPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF A HUMAN POLYMORPHIC EPITHELIAL MUCIN MUC1 IN TRANSGENIC MICE", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 52, no. 7, 1992, pages 1954 - 1960, XP000915268, ISSN: 0008-5472
  • See also references of WO 9817300A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817300 A1 19980430; CA 2269349 A1 19980430; EP 0964694 A1 19991222; EP 0964694 A4 20000913; JP 2001502907 A 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020604

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-09-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/00 A, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7C 07K 14/47 B, 7C 07K 16/18 B

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB LI